CA SB350 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11369 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [03-23-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2022-01-11SenateJanuary 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 2747.)
2022-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 11.
2021-03-23SenateMarch 23 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 1. Page 592.) Reconsideration granted.
2021-03-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-03-03SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11369New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback