CA SB35 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 20 (commencing with Section 26205) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to food.
Title
Food donations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 680.) | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-01-29 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2008-12-11 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 10. | |
2008-12-10 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |