CA SB349 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 14 (commencing with Section 11857) to Part 2 of Division 10.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance abuse.
Title
California Ethical Treatment for Persons with Substance Use Disorder Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB349 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - SB 349 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB349 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - SB 349 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB349 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-04-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-04-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3303.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4045.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-02-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Petrie-Norris. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 13). |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1277.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1188.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 686.) (April 6). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 533.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11857 | New Code | See Bill Text |