CA SB348 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-14 - August 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-14 - August 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 12897) to Part 2.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Department of Technology: artificial intelligence: strategic plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB348 Chang et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB348 Chang et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A. & A.R. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1246.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1097.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12897 | New Code | See Bill Text |