CA SB346 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 67434 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: the California Promise.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB346 Glazer et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-07-11AssemblyJuly 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) Reconsideration granted.
2017-07-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-06-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-21AssemblyJune 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-20SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 764.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 444.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code53310Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53311Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53312Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code53313Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code67434Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback