CA SB345 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 383 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy programs and projects: nonenergy benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20SenateMay 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-04-05SenateApril 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-03-25SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2021-03-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 499.) (March 15).
2021-03-02SenateSet for hearing March 15.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code383New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback