CA SB343 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 17138.4 and 24308.8 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income taxes: gross income exclusions: Kast Property Tank Farm facility cleanup.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB343 Bradford Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 343 Bradford Third Reading Urgency By GIPSON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB343 Bradford Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6057.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2018-02-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2519.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-25SenateSet for hearing September 1.
2017-07-17SenateJuly 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-11SenateSet for hearing July 17.
2017-07-06SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2017-06-20SenateSet for hearing June 28.
2017-06-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-06-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17073Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17138.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17209New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17212New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24308.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24347.15New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback