CA SB343 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 798, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 798, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2053.1, 2054, and 2054.2 of, and to repeal Section 2054.1 of, the Penal Code, relating to corrections.
Title
Corrections: inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 343 Hancock Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB343 Hancock (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB343 Hancock (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 798, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. (Corrected September 8) |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2853.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 27). |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 1253.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1152.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 729.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2053.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2054 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2054.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2054.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2933.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |