CA SB341 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53122 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 910 of, and to add Section 776.2 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.
Title
Telecommunications service: outages.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB341 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 341 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Emergency Management] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB341 McGuire et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 341 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Emergency Management] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB341 McGuire et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2584.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2887.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 26). |
2021-07-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-25 | Assembly | June 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.M. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and E.M. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1090.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1009.) (May 3). |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1. Page 684.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 499.) (March 15). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and G.O. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 776.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |