CA SB34 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 297, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 297, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6102 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: authorized agent: limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] |
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB34 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 34 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Daly (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB34 Umberg Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 34 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Daly (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB34 Umberg Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 297, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5224.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4884.) |
2022-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4835.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5884.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 2801.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Hertzberg. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Umberg. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | April 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 604.) (March 24). |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 6102 | New Code | See Bill Text |