CA SB34 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 532, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1798.29 and 1798.82 of, and to add Title 1.81.23 (commencing with Section 1798.90.5) to Part 4 of Division 3 of, the Civil Code, relating to personal information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automated license plate recognition systems: use of data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB34 Hill Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 34 Hill Senate Third Reading By GATTO (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB34 Hill (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 532, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-06 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2015-09-04SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2494.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-09-03SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-09-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 2843.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-09-01AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 19).
2015-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
2015-07-02AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. (Corrected July 9).
2015-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2015-05-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P.
2015-05-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-05-07SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 930.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-05-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 884.) (May 4).
2015-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 4.
2015-04-22SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 619.) (April 14).
2015-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 14.
2015-04-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 526.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-03-10SenateSet for hearing April 7.
2015-01-15SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
2014-12-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
2014-12-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.29Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.82Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.90.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_34&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_bill_20141201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_bill_20150422_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_bill_20150702_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_bill_20150713_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_bill_20150901_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_bill_20150908_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_bill_20151006_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_vote_20150407_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_vote_20150414_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_vote_20150504_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_vote_20150507_1014AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_vote_20150622_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_vote_20150819_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_vote_20150707_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_vote_20150903_1102AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_34_vote_20150904_0923AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback