CA SB338 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 368.5 of, and to add Section 368.6 to, the Penal Code, and to amend Section 15650 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to elder and dependent adult abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senior and disability victimization: law enforcement policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB338 Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S.
2019-05-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 917.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-10SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-10SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-04-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 526.) (April 2).
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-18SenateMarch 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUMAN S.
2019-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code368.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code368.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code15650Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback