CA SB336 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 487, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 487, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 120120) of Part 1 of Division 105 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Public health: COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB336 Ochoa Bogh et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 336 Ochoa Bogh Third Reading Urgency By Gipson (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB336 Ochoa Bogh et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 336 Ochoa Bogh Third Reading Urgency By Gipson (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB336 Ochoa Bogh et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 487, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2548.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2886.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1344.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1188.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 955.) (April 28). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 120120 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |