CA SB336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 99174 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation: fully-automated transit vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB336 Dodd (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01AssemblyJuly 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-24AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 996.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 805.) (April 23).
2019-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-02SenateApril 9 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-02SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code99174New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback