CA SB336 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10089.40 of the Insurance Code, relating to earthquake insurance.
Title
Earthquake insurance: rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB336 Roth (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 843.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 22). |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10089.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |