CA SB336 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5272 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to outdoor advertising.
Title
Advertising displays.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-04-28 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-23 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-04-21 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-03 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-02-26 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_336&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_336_bill_20090225_introduced.html |