CA SB335 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3212.86, 3212.87, 3212.88, 3761, and 5402 of, and to add Section 5814.3 to, the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB335 Cortese (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB335 Cortese (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Assembly | Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | July 13 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1311.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1188.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 918.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3761 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 5402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 5814.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |