CA SB331 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 638, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 638, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1001 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 12964.5 of the Government Code, relating to civil actions.
Title
Settlement and nondisparagement agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB331 Leyva Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 331 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB331 Leyva (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 331 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB331 Leyva (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 638, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2214.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 2515.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 8). |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 1036.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | May 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 775.) (April 13). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | March 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12964.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |