CA SB329 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 36516 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cities: city council members: compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-12 - Assembly - SB 329 Dodd Senate Third Reading By WILSON (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB329 Dodd et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2023.
2023-06-29 Approved by the Governor.
2023-06-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2023-06-12SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-06-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2220.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-06-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-06-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 7).
2023-05-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2023-05-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 959.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-04-24SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2023-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 19).
2023-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2023-02-15SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2023-02-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
2023-02-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code36516Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback