CA SB328 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1940.8.5 to the Civil Code, relating to rental property.
Title
Landlords: notice of pesticide use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB328 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SB 328 Hueso Senate Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB328 Hueso (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SB 328 Hueso Senate Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB328 Hueso (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2142.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2533.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | July 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1246.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 982.) (May 12). |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | May 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1940.8.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |