CA SB327 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 3).
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 1.81.26 (commencing with Section 1798.91.01) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to information privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information privacy: connected devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB327 Jackson (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 3).
2018-04-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-01-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4068.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-11SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-01-11SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-01-11SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-06-01SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Jackson.
2017-05-30SenatePublished May 26 at 2 p.m.
2017-05-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time and amended.
2017-05-17SenatePublished May 17 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1020.) (May 9).
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing May 9.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2017-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.84Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.91.01New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback