CA SB320 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3044, 6304, 6306, 6323, and 6389 of, and to add Section 6322.5 to, the Family Code, to amend Sections 11108.2, 25555, 26379, 26405, 26540, and 30342 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 213.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence protective orders: possession of a firearm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB320 Eggman et al. By Rubio Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Assembly - SB 320 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB320 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Assembly - SB 320 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB320 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2610.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3015.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Chau. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1344.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1187.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 590.) (March 23). |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 3044 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 6304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 6306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 6322.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 6323 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 6389 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11108.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26379 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30342 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 213.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |