CA SB319 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 148.5 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.
Title
State highways: Department of Transportation: German autobahn report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and EQ. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 148.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB319 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB319 |