CA SB317 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 88651 of the Education Code, relating to economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Community Colleges Economic and Workforce Development Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB317 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1355.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-03-23SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2017-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66000Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88651Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback