CA SB316 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - August 30 set for first hearing.Testimony taken.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6072 and 6073 of, and to add Sections 6073.1 and 6073.2 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorneys: pro bono legal aid services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB316 Wieckowski (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 set for first hearing.Testimony taken.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 11).
2017-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-19AssemblyJune 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1260.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 852.) (April 25).
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-13SenateApril 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-29SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2017-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code6072Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6073Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6073.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code6073.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback