CA SB315 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27281 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 5600, 5608, 5624, 5626, 5632, 5642, 5644, 5652, 5660, 5674, 5682, 5690, and 5694 of, to add Sections 5605, 5615, 5618, 5625, 5658, 5659, 5677, 5678, 5681, and 5698 to, to repeal Section 5676 of, and to repeal and add Section 5610 of, the Probate Code, relating to revocable transfer on death deeds.
Title
Revocable transfer on death deeds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB315 Roth Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 315 Roth Senate Third Reading By Chau (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB315 Roth (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 315 Roth Senate Third Reading By Chau (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB315 Roth (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2352.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2593.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Chau. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1254.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1187.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 686.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |