CA SB315 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 392, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 7011.4, 7027.2, 7028, and 7110.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to contractors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB315 Lieu Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 315 Lieu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Special Consent #5 SB315 Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 392, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2014-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2014-08-22SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4756.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2014-08-20SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4670.)
2014-08-19SenateSet for hearing August 20.
2014-08-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4543.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2014-08-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2014-08-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6046.) Ordered to the Senate.
2014-08-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-08-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
2014-07-02AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
2014-06-17AssemblySet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
2014-06-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2014-05-29AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-08-13AssemblySet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-06-05AssemblyHearing postponed by committee.
2013-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2013-05-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 973.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-15SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2013-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 852.) (May 7).
2013-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2013-05-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2013-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_315&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_bill_20130215_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_bill_20130430_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_bill_20130215_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_bill_20130430_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_bill_20140529_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_bill_20140618_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_bill_20140702_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_bill_20140825_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_bill_20140917_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_vote_20130507_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_vote_20130520_0127PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_vote_20140605_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_vote_20140624_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_vote_20140806_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_vote_20140814_1153AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_vote_20140820_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_315_vote_20140822_1027AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback