CA SB314 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 656, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 23399 and 25607 of, and to add and repeal Section 25750.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB314 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 314 Wiener Third Reading Urgency By Gabriel (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB314 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 656, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-03SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-02SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-02AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1343.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1187.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-15SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2021-04-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-02-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
2021-02-04SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback