CA SB314 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15657 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to elders and dependent adults.
Title
Elders and dependent adults: abandonment.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Assembly - SB 314 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB314 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB314 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2234.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 563.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 438.) (March 26). |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15657 | Amended Code | Citation Text |