CA SB311 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 556, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26110 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial cannabis activity: licensed distributors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB311 Pan Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 311 Pan Third Reading Urgency By LOW (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB311 Pan (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 556, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-31SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m.
2018-08-23SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 5627.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2018-08-22SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 5619.)
2018-08-21SenateSet for hearing August 22.
2018-08-20SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-08-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 6305.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 6. Page 766.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 488.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-16SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2017-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19326Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26110Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback