CA SB311 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 556, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 556, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26110 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Commercial cannabis activity: licensed distributors.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB311 Pan Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 311 Pan Third Reading Urgency By LOW (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB311 Pan (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 311 Pan Third Reading Urgency By LOW (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB311 Pan (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 556, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 5627.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 5619.) |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Set for hearing August 22. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 6305.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 6. Page 766.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 488.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19326 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |