CA SB311 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 7.6 (commencing with Section 8239.15) of Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to preschool, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Child Care and Development Services Act: preschool: Alum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB311 Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB311 Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1252.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1151.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 647.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8239.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8239.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |