CA SB311 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12693.516 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Healthy Families Program: prospective payment system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-01 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 637.) | |
2009-04-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 22. | |
2009-04-02 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-02-26 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |