CA SB309 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 388, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4027 and 5009 of, and to add Sections 2607 and 4027.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional facilities: religious accommodations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB309 Cortese et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 309 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB309 Cortese et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 388, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-20 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2023-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2737.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-09-12SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-09-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3258.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2023-09-07AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2023-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2023-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2023-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1363.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2023-05-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1164.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-04-24SenateApril 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2023-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 659.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-08SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2023-02-15SenateReferred to Com. on PUB S.
2023-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2023-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code2607New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code4027Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4027.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code5009Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback