CA SB308 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1532 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to unclaimed property.
Title
Unclaimed property: electronic funds transfer.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-08 - Assembly - SB 308 Min Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB308 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB308 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-07-08 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2278.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 612.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 422.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |