CA SB305 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4.9 (commencing with Section 1649) to Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compassionate Access to Medical Cannabis Act or Ryan’s Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB305 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 305 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB305 Hueso et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13 Veto sustained.
2020-01-13 Stricken from file.
2019-10-12 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-12 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-18SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2834.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3170.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-07-02AssemblyJuly 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1152.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 714.) (April 10).
2019-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2019-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1649New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback