CA SB303 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 69 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation: transfer of base year value: disaster relief.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB303 Borgeas et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2021-04-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-04-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 968.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-04-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-05SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2021-03-22SenateMarch 22 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-03-16SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2021-03-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 480.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-02SenateSet for hearing March 11.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-02-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code69Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback