CA SB300 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 15 (commencing with Section 111224) to Chapter 5 of Part 5 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Sugar-sweetened beverages: health warnings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 111224 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB300 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB300 |