CA SB299 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13951, 13956, and 13963 of the Government Code, relating to victim compensation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Victim compensation: use of force by a law enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] |
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] | Sen. John Laird [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB299 Leyva et al (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB299 Leyva et al (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Grayson. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 1385.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 778.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13963 | Amended Code | Citation Text |