CA SB299 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16520, 26835, and 27535 of, and to add Division 4.5 (commencing with Section 25250) to Title 4 of Part 6 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: lost or stolen: reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB299 DeSaulnier Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB299 DeSaulnier Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB299 DeSaulnier Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 299 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB299 DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB299 DeSaulnier Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB299 DeSaulnier Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 299 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB299 DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2013-10-11 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-11 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2299.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2300.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2301.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 3042.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1153.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 719.) (April 29). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 568.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25250 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 26835 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27535 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |