CA SB296 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 637, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 637, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 829.7 to the Penal Code, relating to code enforcement officers.
Title
Code enforcement officers: safety standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 296 Limón Senate Third Reading By Jones-Sawyer (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB296 Limón (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB296 Limón (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 637, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2602.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1336.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 592.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 829.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |