CA SB294 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 214 of, and to add Section 214.20 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation: welfare exemption: low income housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB294 Hill Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 294 Hill Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB294 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13 Veto sustained.
2020-01-13 Stricken from file.
2019-10-12 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-12 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-06SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2609.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-06SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-05SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3044.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-01AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-06-24AssemblyJune 24 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1095.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-08SenateApril 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 465.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code214Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code214.20New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback