CA SB293 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-23 - August 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-23 - August 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14683 of, and to add Section 14682.2 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal specialty mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB293 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB293 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-23 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1349.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 532.) (March 17). |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14682.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14683 | Amended Code | Citation Text |