CA SB292 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 485, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 485, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 81000, 81001, 81002, 81003, 81004, 81004.5, 81006, 81008, and 81012 of, to amend and repeal Sections 81007 and 81011 of, and to add Section 81004.6 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to industrial hemp.
Title
Industrial hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB292 Wilk et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 292 Wilk Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB292 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 292 Wilk Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB292 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 485, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2211.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 886.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 552.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and PUB. S. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 81000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81004.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81004.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81007 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81011 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |