CA SB292 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 31000.6 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties: contract legal counsel: auditor-controller.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB292 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1355.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 852.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-04-06SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 538.) (March 29).
2017-03-16SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2017-03-15SenateMarch 22 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S.
2017-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code24054Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code26881.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code29611Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code31000.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code424Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback