CA SB291 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 863, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 863, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49056 to, and to repeal Section 44807.5 of, the Education Code, relating to pupil rights.
Title
Pupil rights: recess.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB291 Newman Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 291 Newman Senate Third Reading By Muratsuchi (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB291 Newman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 291 Newman Senate Third Reading By Muratsuchi (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB291 Newman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 863, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2737.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3252.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1387.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1164.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 681.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44807.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49056 | New Code | See Bill Text |