CA SB291 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 917, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 917, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 33590 of the Education Code, relating to special education.
Title
Advisory Commission on Special Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB291 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 291 Stern Senate Third Reading By Megan Dahle (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB291 Stern (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 291 Stern Senate Third Reading By Megan Dahle (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB291 Stern (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 917, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5341.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5997.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2801.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Hertzberg. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Stern. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 667.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33590 | Amended Code | Citation Text |