CA SB290 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8566.5 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural disasters: insurance and related alternative risk-transfer products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB290 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-03-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-27SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-03-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 437.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-08SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS.
2019-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8566.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback