CA SB29 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3000.5 and 3019.7 of the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: vote by mail ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Assembly - SB 29 Umberg Third Reading Urgency By Berman (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB29 Umberg et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB29 Umberg et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-02-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-02-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2021-02-17 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 332.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (February 9). |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Pursuant to Assembly Rule 51. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 119.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 95.) (January 21). |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 72.) (January 14). |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 3000.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3019.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |