CA SB29 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14007.8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: eligibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB29 Durazo et al (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB29 Durazo et al (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 78 suspended. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1351.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1087.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 384.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14007.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |